ME LD1514 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1514 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 14 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - LD 1514 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 14 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Conform Maine Law to the Requirements of the American Dental Association Commission on Dental Accreditation
Title
An Act To Conform Maine Law to the Requirements of the American Dental Association Commission on Dental Accreditation
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. James Dill [D] | Sen. Earle Mccormick [R] |
Sen. John Patrick [D] | Sen. Russell Black [R] | Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #715 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #656 (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Adopt Sas-524 RC #682 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-b Rpt RC #655 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-29 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #656 (Y: 141 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Adopt Sas-524 RC #682 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-b Rpt RC #655 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | LD 1514 In Senate, April 29, 2016, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 In Favor and 14 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2016-04-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-29 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 656V 141 having voted in the affirmative and 7 in the negative, with 3 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2016-04-29 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2016-04-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-14 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-524) thereto |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-524) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-524) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 682 Yeas 33 - Nays 2 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BURNS of Washington Senate Amendment "A" (S-524) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) READ |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Subsequently, The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) Report in concurrence |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 655 Yeas 15 - Nays 20 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Subsequently, Motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland to ACCEPT The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-594) Report FAILED |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-08 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Reports READ |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-654) thereto. |
2016-04-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-654) thereto ADOPTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | On motion of Representative MASTRACCIO of Sanford, House Amendment "A" (H-654) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-593) was READ. |
2016-04-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-07 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2016-04-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-24 | House | Later today assigned. |
2016-03-24 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2016-03-24 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2016-03-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-12-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2015-12-28 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 22, 2015. |