ME LD1514 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-26 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Promote Efficiency and To Streamline Access to the Circuitbreaker Program Application Process
Title
Resolve, To Promote Efficiency and To Streamline Access to the Circuitbreaker Program Application Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-440). | |
2010-03-23 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-23 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-440) In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-23 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-440) READ and ADOPTED (Remarks Made) | |
2010-03-23 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator House Amendment "A" (H-713) INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-03-23 | (S) House Amendment "A" (H-713) READ | |
2010-03-23 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot The Senate RECEDED From PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2010-03-23 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-17 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-16 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-16 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION | |
2010-03-11 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-713) . | |
2010-03-11 | (H) On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "A" (H-713) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) On motion of Representative CROCKETT of Augusta, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-02 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2010-02-25 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-02-25 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-02-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-12-10 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-10 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 8, 2009. |