ME LD1512 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on July 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Study the Establishment of the Office of the Education Ombudsman
Title
Resolve, To Study the Establishment of the Office of the Education Ombudsman
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #151 (Y: 81 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) in concurrence |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-355). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-355) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 151 (Yeas 81 - Nays 62 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 13, 2021. |