ME LD1506 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Usage and Consumer Protections of Guaranteed Asset Protection Waivers
Title
An Act To Amend the Usage and Consumer Protections of Guaranteed Asset Protection Waivers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-154) thereto. |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-154) thereto ADOPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-154) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) was READ. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-07 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-154) thereto |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-154) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Senate Amendment "A" (S-154) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) was READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-142) READ |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Subsequently the Report Accepted |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Report READ |
2017-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |