ME LD1503 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Criteria for Issuing a Certificate of Approval for Certain Projects under the Finance Authority of Maine Act
Title
An Act To Amend Criteria for Issuing a Certificate of Approval for Certain Projects under the Finance Authority of Maine Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-23 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2017-05-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Assigned for SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2017-04-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |