ME LD1489 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize the Revocation, Suspension or Denial of a Guide License under Specified Circumstances
Title
An Act To Authorize the Revocation, Suspension or Denial of a Guide License under Specified Circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-206). |
2017-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-06-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-206). |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-206) READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |