ME LD1481 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Clearance for Occupancy Under the Lead Poisoning Control Act
Title
An Act Regarding Clearance for Occupancy Under the Lead Poisoning Control Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] | Rep. Amy Roeder [D] |
Rep. Charles Skold [D] | Sen. Michael Tipping [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2023-06-13 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-278) thereto. |
2023-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-278) thereto ADOPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-278) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) was READ. |
2023-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-13 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-278) thereto |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-278) thereto ADOPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland Senate Amendment "A" (S-278) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-249) READ |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2023-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |