ME LD1480 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, Regarding the Maine State Cultural Building in Augusta
Title
Resolve, Regarding the Maine State Cultural Building in Augusta
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-26 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-26 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-21 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-21 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-21 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-05-21 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) The Resolve was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Reported by Representative BEAUDETTE for the Joint Standing Committee on State and Local Government pursuant to Resolve 2007, chapter 151, section 4. |