ME LD1479 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 33 Yeas - 2 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - 33 Yeas - 2 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Telecommunications Regulation Reform
Title
An Act To Clarify Telecommunications Regulation Reform
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #653 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #762 (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #762 (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | 33 Yeas - 2 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call # 653 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | LD 1479 In Senate, May 1, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 33 in the Affirmative and 2 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2014-05-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 762V 134 having voted in the affirmative and 12 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2014-05-01 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Subsequently, PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-04-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-08 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator JACKSON of Aroostook. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-740) , in concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-740) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-04-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Acceptance of EITHER REPORT |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-740). |
2014-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-740) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-27 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-27 | House | On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY |
2013-04-30 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-30 | House | Representative HOBBINS for the Joint Standing Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology pursuant to Public Law 2011, chapter 623, Part A, section 25 and Part D, section 7 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |