ME LD1478 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Reestablish Recreational Use of a Historic Trolley Line in the Town of Gray
Title
An Act To Reestablish Recreational Use of a Historic Trolley Line in the Town of Gray
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Susan Austin [R] | Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Patrick Corey [R] |
Rep. Eleanor Espling [R] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] | Rep. Jared Golden [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #471 (Y: 83 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-02-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 471 (Yeas 83 - Nays 61 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2016-02-09 | House | On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator SAVIELLO of Franklin The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 18, 2015 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |