ME LD1477 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Facilitate the Use of Ranked-choice Voting for Governor and Members of the Legislature

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Facilitate the Use of Ranked-choice Voting for Governor and Members of the Legislature

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #108 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #97 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2020-03-17HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-28SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2019-05-28SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - 2/3 Present Required, in NON-CONCURRENCE.
2019-05-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HouseThis being a Constitutional Amendment, a two-thirds vote of the membership of the House present being necessary, a total was taken.
2019-05-23HouseFAILED FINAL PASSAGE.
2019-05-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-236) in concurrence
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-236) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-21SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 108 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-21SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-05-21SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-16SenateUnfinished Business
2019-05-16SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2019-05-16SenateSenator LUCHINI of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-16SenateReports READ
2019-05-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HouseThe RESOLUTION was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-236).
2019-05-14HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the RESOLUTION was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-14HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-236) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-14HouseThe RESOLUTION was READ ONCE.
2019-05-14HouseROLL CALL NO. 97 (Yeas 85 - Nays 54 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-14HouseOn motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-14HouseReports READ.
2019-04-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-04-02HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback