ME LD1474 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for the 2016 and 2017 Allocations of the State Ceiling on Private Activity Bonds
Title
An Act To Provide for the 2016 and 2017 Allocations of the State Ceiling on Private Activity Bonds
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Volk [R] | Sen. Erin Herbig [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-02-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-02-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-348). |
2016-02-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-02-02 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-348) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-01-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-01-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Ought to Pass As Amended Report Accepted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-01-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending Acceptance of OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Report READ |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 18, 2015 and REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |