ME LD1461 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-16 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require the State To Divest Itself of Assets Invested in the Fossil Fuel Industry
Title
An Act To Require the State To Divest Itself of Assets Invested in the Fossil Fuel Industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE. |
2013-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1461&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1046&item=1&snum=126 |