ME LD1460 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Revise the Department of Health and Human Services Rehabilitation and Reunification Process
Title
An Act To Revise the Department of Health and Human Services Rehabilitation and Reunification Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-11 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021. |