ME LD1458 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Study Business Format Franchising
Title
Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Study Business Format Franchising
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Accept Rpt "b" Opt-a RC #524 (Y: 10 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-31 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #597 (Y: 75 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - Acc Report 'b' Otp As Amend RC #597 (Y: 75 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONING the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senator HASKELL of Cumberland moved to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE Bill and accompanying papers , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Study Table by Senator ALFOND of Cumberland. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator HASKELL of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE , in concurrence. |
2014-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-10 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-04-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-09 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-669). |
2014-04-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-04-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-03 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-04-03 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-669) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-669) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-669) Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 524 10 Yeas - 24 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent FAILED |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Subsequently, ACCEPTANCE of Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) , in concurrence. FAILED |
2014-04-02 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-01 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) , in concurrence. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator PATRICK of Oxford moved to Accept the Report B Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) Report , in concurrence. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (H-670). |
2014-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Committee Amendment "B" (H-670) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 597 (Yeas 75 - Nays 60 - Absent 16 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-31 | House | Subsequently, REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-19 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended. |
2014-03-19 | House | Representative HERBIG of Belfast moved to ACCEPT REPORT B Ought to Pass as Amended. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence. |
2013-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |