ME LD1454 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - 471 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-21 - 471 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Reauthorizing the Balance of the 2009 Bond Issue for Land Conservation Projects
Title
Resolve, Reauthorizing the Balance of the 2009 Bond Issue for Land Conservation Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-21 - Senate - Final Passage-emer 2/3 Elect RC #471 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - Adopt Hbh-508 To Hah-505 RC #466 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - House - Adopt Hah-505 RC #464 (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - Adopt Hbh-508 To Hah-505 RC #466 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-07-16 - House - Adopt Hah-505 RC #464 (Y: 90 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | 471 Yeas 34 - Nays 0 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number |
2016-01-21 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-01-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-19 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-505) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "B" (H-508) thereto in concurrence |
2016-01-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-01-12 | House | RELEASED. |
2016-01-12 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan. |
2016-01-12 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2016-01-12 | House | Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-505) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-508) thereto |
2016-01-12 | House | House Amendment "A" (H-505) as Amended by House Amendment "B" (H-508) thereto ADOPTED. |
2016-01-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 466 (Yeas 147 - Nays 0 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2016-01-12 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "B" (H-508) to House Amendment "A" (H-505) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-01-12 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of House Amendment "A" (H-505). |
2016-01-12 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-505). |
2016-01-12 | House | On motion of Representative GROHMAN of Biddeford, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Resolve was FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-01-12 | House | Resolve RECALLED From Governor (Pursuant to Joint Order - House Paper 1048) |
2015-07-16 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2015-07-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-07-16 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Sent forthwith to the Engrossing Division. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-505) Without Reference to a Committee , in concurrence. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-505) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ TWICE |
2015-07-16 | House | RELEASED. |
2015-07-16 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan. |
2015-07-16 | House | Subsequently, the Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-505). |
2015-07-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 464 (Yeas 90 - Nays 52 - Absent 8 - Excused 0)(Vacancy 1) |
2015-07-16 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, House Amendment "A" (H-505) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-07-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules and WITHOUT REFERENCE to a Committee, the Resolve was READ TWICE. |
2015-07-16 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |