ME LD1442 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Provide for Court-appointed Advocates for Justice in Animal Cruelty Cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Provide for Court-appointed Advocates for Justice in Animal Cruelty Cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #291 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #238 (Y: 88 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-574) in concurrence
2019-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-574) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-12SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-12SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 291 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator CARPENTER of Aroostook the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-12SenateReports Read
2019-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-574).
2019-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-574) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-12HouseROLL CALL NO. 238 (Yeas 88 - Nays 52 - Absent 10 - Excused 1)
2019-06-12HouseOn motion of Representative BAILEY of Saco, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-12HouseReports READ.
2019-04-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2019-04-02HouseCommittee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback