ME LD1428 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase the Availability of Intranasal Naloxone in Community and Corrections Settings
Title
An Act To Increase the Availability of Intranasal Naloxone in Community and Corrections Settings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) in concurrence |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLAXTON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-876). |
2022-03-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-876) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-31 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-20 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021. |