ME LD1406 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Promote Prescription Drug Price Transparency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Promote Prescription Drug Price Transparency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2018-04-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-17HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2018-04-17HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-17HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-452).
2018-04-17SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-04-17SenateOn motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-452) AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "B" (S-452)
2018-04-13HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-04-13HouseIn NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence.
2018-04-13HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-451).
2018-04-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2018-04-13HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-451) was READ and ADOPTED.
2018-04-13HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2018-04-13HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-04-13HouseReports READ.
2018-04-12SenateSent down for concurrence
2018-04-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-452)
2018-04-12SenateCommittee Amendment "B" (S-452) READ and ADOPTED
2018-04-12SenateREAD ONCE
2018-04-12SenateOn motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-452) Report ACCEPTED
2018-04-12SenateTaken from the table by the President
2018-04-11SenateUnfinished Business
2018-04-11SenateOn motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2018-04-11SenateReports READ
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-04-25HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-04-25HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
2017-04-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-04-20SenateOn motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
2017-04-20SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-04-19SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-18SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-13SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-11SenateUnfinished Business
2017-04-11SenateOn motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2017-04-11SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback