ME LD1403 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Maine Businesses, Nonprofits, Educational Institutions and Municipalities during the COVID-19 Pandemic
Title
An Act To Protect Maine Businesses, Nonprofits, Educational Institutions and Municipalities during the COVID-19 Pandemic
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #412 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #324 (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #324 (Y: 81 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 324 (Yeas 81 - Nays 58 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-05 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 5, 2021. |