ME LD1377 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-03 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Campaign Finance Disclosure and the Filing of Statements of Sources of Income
Title
An Act Regarding Campaign Finance Disclosure and the Filing of Statements of Sources of Income
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-157), in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-157) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-05-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-157). |
2021-05-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-05-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2021-04-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed. |
2021-04-05 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 5, 2021. |
2021-04-05 | House | Reported by Representative CAIAZZO for the Commission on Governmental Ethics and Election Practices pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 1, section 1009. |