ME LD136 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Eviction Process
Title
An Act Regarding the Eviction Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-98). |
2017-05-18 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-98) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-98) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Report READ |
2017-02-02 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-02-02 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2017-02-02 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-01-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-01-19 | House | In concurrence. Later today assigned. |
2017-01-19 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |