ME LD1350 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding School Administrator Effectiveness
Title
An Act Regarding School Administrator Effectiveness
Sponsors
Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Rep. Bruce Macdonald [D] | Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] |
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp Am RC #286 (Y: 85 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #228 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #228 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-07-09 | Senate | FAILED ENACTMENT , in concurrence. 2/3 Elected Required. |
2013-07-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-07-09 | House | FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-358) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-358) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-358) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-358) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-258). |
2013-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 286 (Yeas 85 - Nays 61 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-258).. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (18 -Yeas, 16 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call Number 228 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland Report "A" Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-258) Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-04-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-09 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |