ME LD1344 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-03 - (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Summary
Resolve, To Authorize a Pilot Project on Ranked Choice Voting
Title
Resolve, To Authorize a Pilot Project on Ranked Choice Voting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | (S) Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2009-06-03 | (S) On motion by Senator SULLIVAN of York Resolve and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED in concurrence | |
2009-06-03 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville the Resolve and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-29 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-05-29 | (H) On motion of Representative TRINWARD of Waterville TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. | |
2009-05-29 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-03-31 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator Sullivan of York, REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on LEGAL AND VETERANS AFFAIRS. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Committee on Legal and Veterans Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |