ME LD1335 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Department of Environmental Protection Concerning Product Stewardship in Maine
Title
An Act To Implement Recommendations of the Department of Environmental Protection Concerning Product Stewardship in Maine
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-470), in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-470) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-470). |
2013-06-13 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-13 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-470) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-13 | House | Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2013-06-12 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2013-06-12 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative WELSH of Rockport REMOVED. |
2013-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Boyle of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-04 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2013-04-04 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-04 | House | Representative WELSH for the Joint Standing Committee on Environment and Natural Resources pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 38, section 1773 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |