ME LD1332 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require State and Congressional Elections To Be Decided by a Plurality of Votes Cast
Title
RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Require State and Congressional Elections To Be Decided by a Plurality of Votes Cast
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Johansen [R] | Rep. Danny Costain [R] | Rep. John DeVeau [R] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] |
Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #106 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #94 (Y: 86 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #94 (Y: 86 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 106 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-05-16 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report, |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senator LUCHINI of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 94 (Yeas 86 - Nays 52 - Absent 10 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-05-14 | House | On motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-19 | House | The RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |