ME LD1325 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Make Permanent the Submission of Certain Reports Concerning Child Welfare to the Legislature
Title
An Act to Make Permanent the Submission of Certain Reports Concerning Child Welfare to the Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-248). |
2023-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-248). |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-248) READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-09 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-04 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |