ME LD1322 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Direct Legislative Staff To Recodify and Revise the Maine Probate Code and To Direct the Probate and Trust Law Advisory Commission and the Family Law Advisory Commission To Study and Make Recommendations on Related Issues
Title
Resolve, To Direct Legislative Staff To Recodify and Revise the Maine Probate Code and To Direct the Probate and Trust Law Advisory Commission and the Family Law Advisory Commission To Study and Make Recommendations on Related Issues
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-15 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-539), in concurrence. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-539) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2016-03-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-539). |
2016-03-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-03-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-04-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |