ME LD1312 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - (S) On motion by Senator HASTINGS of Oxford The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To INDEFINITE POSTPONEMENT of Bill and accompanying papers Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - (S) On motion by Senator HASTINGS of Oxford The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To INDEFINITE POSTPONEMENT of Bill and accompanying papers Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require That Notaries Public Keep Records of Notarial Acts
Title
An Act To Require That Notaries Public Keep Records of Notarial Acts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | (S) On motion by Senator HASTINGS of Oxford The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To INDEFINITE POSTPONEMENT of Bill and accompanying papers Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | |
2011-06-09 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-09 | (H) In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. | |
2011-06-09 | (H) On motion of Representative COTTA of China the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. | |
2011-06-09 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-06 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-03 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-02 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-06-01 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2011-05-19 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) On motion of Representative CAIN of Orono, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) The Committee Report was READ. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) On OBJECTION of Representative CAIN of Orono REMOVED. | |
2011-05-19 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-05-19 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-19 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-18 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2011-05-18 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (S-117) READ and ADOPTED | |
2011-03-29 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-29 | (S) On motion by Senator Thomas of Somerset REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2011-03-29 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-03-29 | (S) Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1312&snum=125 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0409&item=1&snum=125 |