ME LD1295 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require the Use of Preapproved Subcontractors for Publicly Funded Construction Projects
Title
An Act To Require the Use of Preapproved Subcontractors for Publicly Funded Construction Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Insist RC #271 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #268 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #250 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - House - Recede And Concur RC #301 (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #275 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #268 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #250 (Y: 15 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-12 - House - Recede And Concur RC #301 (Y: 59 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #275 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-13 | Senate | (33 -Yeas, 2 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Number 271 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc, the Senate INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-13 | Senate | (17 -Yeas, 18 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Number 268 |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc to RECEDE and CONCUR to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and Passage to be Engrossed as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-417) FAILED. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-417). |
2013-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 301 (Yeas 59 - Nays 84 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-12 | House | Motion of Representative WILLETTE of Mapleton to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Subsequently, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | FAILED |
2013-06-12 | Senate | (15 -Yeas, 20 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Senator PATRICK of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence. (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) Roll Call Number 250 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-417). |
2013-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-417) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 275 (Yeas 87 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-04-10 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-10 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec, requested and received leave of the Senate to WITHDRAW her Motion to Refer to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec moved to REFER to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence. |
2013-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |