ME LD1286 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, to Establish the Blue Economy Task Force to Support Maine's Emergence as a Center for Blue Economy Innovation and Opportunity in the 21st Century
Title
Resolve, to Establish the Blue Economy Task Force to Support Maine's Emergence as a Center for Blue Economy Innovation and Opportunity in the 21st Century
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #216 (Y: 80 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #320 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #320 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-25 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2023-07-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-07-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-07-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-476) thereto. |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2023-07-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-476) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-476) thereto ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-476) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) was ADOPTED |
2023-07-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) |
2023-07-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2023-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-15 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2023-06-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-296). |
2023-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 216 (Yeas 80 - Nays 66 - Absent 4 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative ROBERTS of South Berwick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-296) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 320 Yeas 24 - Nays 9 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CURRY of Waldo The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-13 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-23 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |