ME LD128 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Authorize the Commissioner of Transportation To Enter into Agreements with the United States Department of Transportation
Title
An Act To Authorize the Commissioner of Transportation To Enter into Agreements with the United States Department of Transportation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-04-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-04-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-02-23 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on January 19, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |