ME LD1278 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Ensure Equitable Support for Long-term Energy Contracts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Ensure Equitable Support for Long-term Energy Contracts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-25SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2014-02-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2014-02-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2014-02-13HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2014-02-13HousePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-384).
2014-02-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2014-02-13HouseUnder suspension of the rules
2014-02-13HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2014-02-11SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2014-02-11SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-384).
2014-02-11SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-384) READ and ADOPTED.
2014-02-11SenateREAD ONCE.
2014-02-11SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED.
2013-07-10SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
2013-07-09HouseCarried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145.
2013-04-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2013-04-02HouseBill REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2013-04-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
2013-04-02SenateOn motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY
2013-04-02SenateCommittee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY suggested and ordered printed

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback