ME LD1270 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Patient-directed Care at the End of Life
Title
An Act Regarding Patient-directed Care at the End of Life
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Insist RC #248 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Insist RC #238 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - Acc Min Ought To Pass Rep RC #254 (Y: 76 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #227 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Insist RC #238 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - House - Acc Min Ought To Pass Rep RC #254 (Y: 76 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #227 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-16 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Senate INSISTED to Acceptance of The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE. On motion by Same Senator The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE. Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 248 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator KATZ of Kennebec. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call # 238 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Majority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending His Motion to INSIST |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered |
2015-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate Insisted to ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-15 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2015-06-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 254 (Yeas 76 - Nays 70 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Minority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 227 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-04-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-07 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-04-07 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |