ME LD1260 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox taken from the Special Highway Table PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox taken from the Special Highway Table PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Ignition Interlock Devices on Vehicles Operated by First-time Offenders of Operating Under the Influence
Title
An Act To Allow Ignition Interlock Devices on Vehicles Operated by First-time Offenders of Operating Under the Influence
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nutting [R] | Sen. Gary Plummer [R] | Rep. Alan Casavant [D] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] |
Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Rep. Jethro Pease [R] | Rep. Thomas Tyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox taken from the Special Highway Table PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAZUREK of Knox, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-369), in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) |
2013-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Jackson of Aroostook, REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY, in concurrence. |
2013-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2013-03-28 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |