ME LD1259 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Pay Equality
Title
An Act Regarding Pay Equality
Sponsors
Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Denise Tepler [D] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] |
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D] | Rep. David Woodsome [R] | Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #400 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #350 (Y: 79 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #334 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #350 (Y: 79 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #334 (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-07-20 | Senate | LD 1259 In Senate, July 20, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 IN FAVOR and 11 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-173). |
2017-06-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-173) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 350 (Yeas 79 - Nays 68 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-173) READ and ADOPTED Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-173) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 334 Yeas 13 - Nays 22 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senator VOLK of Cumberland moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT |
2017-04-19 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | On motion by KEIM of Oxford for the Committee on Judiciary REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |