ME LD1252 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve Maine's Economy and Energy Security with Cost-effective Technologies
Title
An Act To Improve Maine's Economy and Energy Security with Cost-effective Technologies
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Morrison [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Sen. Justin Chenette [D] |
Rep. Scott Hamann [D] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] | Rep. Mary Nelson [D] | Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #585 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #706 (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #497 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Adopt Hch-744 To Cah-650 RC #568 (Y: 109 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Accept Rpt "a" Otp-a RC #472 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #529 (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #706 (Y: 105 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #497 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - Adopt Hch-744 To Cah-650 RC #568 (Y: 109 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Accept Rpt "a" Otp-a RC #472 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #529 (Y: 95 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2014-04-16 | Senate | LD 1252 In Senate, April 16, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 22 in the Affirmative and 13 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2014-04-15 | Senate | ____________________ |
2014-04-15 | Senate | LD 1631 In Senate, April 15, 2014, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 20 in the Affirmative and 15 in the Negative , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2014-04-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 706V 105 having voted in the affirmative and 41 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2014-04-14 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-03-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2014-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-31 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 497 21 Yeas - 12 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "C" (H-744) thereto , in concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-26 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2014-03-26 | House | Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-744) thereto |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) as Amended by House Amendment "C" (H-744) thereto ADOPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 568 (Yeas 109 - Nays 30 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-26 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, House Amendment "C" (H-744) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-26 | House | On further motion of the same Representative, under FURTHER suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-650). |
2014-03-26 | House | On motion of Representative HARVELL of Farmington, under suspension of the rules, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650). |
2014-03-26 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-24 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) , in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Roll Call # 472 22 Yeas - 12 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Subsequently, Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) ACCEPTED , in concurrence. Roll Call Ordered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-12 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) , in concurrence. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin moved to to ACCEPT Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) , in concurrence. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2014-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-650). |
2014-03-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-650) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 529 (Yeas 95 - Nays 47 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Subsequently, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2014-03-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2014-03-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2014-03-06 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended. |
2014-03-06 | House | Representative McCABE of Skowhegan moved to ACCEPT REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended. |
2014-03-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY, in concurrence. |
2013-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-27 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |