ME LD1243 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Maine Length of Service Award Program Board of Trustees
Title
An Act Regarding the Maine Length of Service Award Program Board of Trustees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-02 | House | The Bill was in the possession of the House when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2017-07-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-07-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-06-07 | House | On further motion of same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2017-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1243&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0866&item=1&snum=128 |