ME LD1242 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Medical Use of Marijuana Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #330 (Y: 25 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-17 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-681) in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-681) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator LUCHINI of Hancock The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-681). |
2021-06-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-681) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-16 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 330 (Yeas 25 - Nays 117 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-16 | House | Motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-03-23 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on March 23, 2021. |