ME LD1239 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Increase Efficiency in Enforcement of the Maine Human Rights Act
Title
An Act To Increase Efficiency in Enforcement of the Maine Human Rights Act
Sponsors
Rep. William Tuell [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Rep. Janice Cooper [D] |
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #300 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-16 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-434). |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Number 300 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending her motion to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report, In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Senator KEIM of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-434). |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-434) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |