ME LD1236 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Maine Insurance Code To Ensure Fair and Reasonable Coverage and Reimbursement of Chiropractic Services
Title
An Act To Amend the Maine Insurance Code To Ensure Fair and Reasonable Coverage and Reimbursement of Chiropractic Services
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Rep. Richard Campbell [R] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Stanley Gerzofsky [D] |
Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] | Rep. Henry Beck [D] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2014-02-06 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-02-06 | House | On motion of Representative TREAT of Hallowell, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-02-06 | House | Reports READ. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-03-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gratwick of Penobscot REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1236&snum=126 |
Text | https://www.mainelegislature.org/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0430&item=1&snum=126 |