ME LD1232 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 18 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 18 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Maintain the Integrity of the Fund for a Healthy Maine
Title
An Act To Maintain the Integrity of the Fund for a Healthy Maine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #363 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #254 (Y: 86 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #174 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #254 (Y: 86 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #174 (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | 18 Yeas - 15 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Roll Call # 363 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-07-09 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Enacted In Senate, June 27, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 18 in the affirmative and 15 in the negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-204) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-354). |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-204) and Senate Amendment "A" (S-354) , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-354) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-204) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-204) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-204). |
2013-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-204) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 254 (Yeas 86 - Nays 51 - Absent 14 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-10 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-07 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Representative FARNSWORTH of Portland moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-204).. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-204) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-06 | Senate | (20 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Number 174 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED . (Remarks Made) (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senator CRAVEN of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-27 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hill of York REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed |