ME LD1231 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Compulsory School Attendance Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Compulsory School Attendance Laws
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] |
Rep. Peter Johnson [R] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Rep. Michael Mcclellan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #350 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-26 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #410 (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - Enactment RC #320 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #237 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #272 (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #410 (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - Enactment RC #320 (Y: 126 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #237 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #272 (Y: 124 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Senate | 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Roll Call # 350 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-06-26 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-06-26 | Senate | EnactedIn Senate, June 14, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 in the Affirmative and 14 in the Negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-26 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 410V 108 having voted in the affirmative and 38 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2013-06-26 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 320 (Yeas 126 - Nays 19 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-12 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-432), in concurrence.. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-11 | Senate | (21 -Yeas, 13 -Nays, 1 -Excused, 0 -Absent) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call Number 237 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-432). |
2013-06-11 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-11 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-432) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 272 (Yeas 124 - Nays 20 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-11 | House | On motion of Representative MacDONALD of Boothbay, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Millett of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |