ME LD1228 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Direct Action on Health Disparities of the Passamaquoddy Tribe and Washington County
Title
Resolve, To Direct Action on Health Disparities of the Passamaquoddy Tribe and Washington County
Sponsors
Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Rep. Henry Joy [R] | Rep. Howard Mcfadden [R] | Rep. Everett Mcleod [R] |
Rep. Anne Perry [D] | Rep. Hannah Pingree [D] | Sen. Kevin Raye [R] | Rep. Madonna Soctomah [N] |
Rep. Dianne Tilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) in concurrence | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-05-29 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-403) | |
2009-05-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-27 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |