ME LD1214 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Mental Health Working Group
Title
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Mental Health Working Group
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-04-07 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY , in concurrence. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-02 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2015-04-02 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-04-02 | House | Representative HOBBINS for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to Resolve 2013, chapter 106, section 3 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1214&snum=127 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0832&item=1&snum=127 |