ME LD1204 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-28 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Develop a Watercraft Safety Education Plan
Title
Resolve, To Develop a Watercraft Safety Education Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Damon [D] | Rep. Jane Eberle [D] | Rep. Jayne Giles [R] | Rep. Leila Percy [D] |
Rep. Joseph Perry [D] | Rep. Benjamin Pratt [D] | Sen. Nancy Sullivan [D] | Rep. Thomas Watson [D] |
Rep. David Webster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-26 | (S) On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-274) | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-21 | (H) On motion of Representative CLARK of Millinocket, The House INSISTED to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-274). | |
2009-05-21 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-05-20 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-05-20 | (H) On motion of Representative CLARK of Millinocket, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-19 | (S) On motion by Senator BRYANT of Oxford Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-05-19 | (S) Reports READ | |
2009-05-18 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-18 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-274) | |
2009-05-18 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2009-05-18 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-274) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) On motion of Representative CLARK of Millinocket, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-14 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2009-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator BRYANT of Oxford The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE | |
2009-04-02 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Subsequently, The House INSISTED to REFERENCE to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2009-04-02 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2009-03-31 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2009-03-31 | (H) On motion of Representative CLARK of Millinocket, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-03-26 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Senator BRYANT of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT and ordered printed In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2009-03-26 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-26 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. | |
2009-03-26 | (H) Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |