ME LD120 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act Regarding Assistance to Low-income Customers of Gas Utilities
Title
An Act Regarding Assistance to Low-income Customers of Gas Utilities
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Blanchard [D] | Sen. Peter Bowman [D] | Rep. Stacy Dostie [D] | Rep. Barry Hobbins [D] |
Rep. David Van Wie [D] | Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-14 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-23) | |
2009-04-09 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-09 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-23) | |
2009-04-07 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-07 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-02 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-02 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-23) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-04-02 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-02 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-01-13 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-01-13 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY. | |
2009-01-13 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-01-13 | (S) On motion by Senator Hobbins of York REFERRED to the Committee on UTILITIES AND ENERGY | |
2009-01-13 | (S) Committee on Utilities and Energy suggested and ordered printed. |