ME LD1198 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Reform Insurance Coverage To Include Diagnosis and Treatment for Autism Spectrum Disorders
Title
An Act To Reform Insurance Coverage To Include Diagnosis and Treatment for Autism Spectrum Disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland TAKEN FROM THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE | |
2010-03-29 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) | |
2010-03-24 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) | |
2010-03-22 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-430) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-03-18 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-03-18 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-06-15 | (S) CARRIED OVER TO ANY SPECIAL OR REGULAR SESSION OF THE 124th LEGISLATURE PURSUANT TO JOINT ORDER HP 1053, IN CONCURRENCE | |
2009-06-13 | (H) Carried over to any special or regular session of the 124th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1053. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-03-25 | (S) On motion by Senator Bowman of York REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |