ME LD1191 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the Fishing Laws
Title
An Act To Strengthen the Fishing Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Espling [R] | Sen. David Dutremble [D] | Rep. Sheryl Briggs [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I] | Rep. Karen Kusiak [D] | Rep. Timothy Marks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-433), in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-433) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-433) |
2013-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Dutremble of York, REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE, in concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE. |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed. |