ME LD1181 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 19 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - 19 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Further Strengthen the Protection of Pregnant Women and Children from Toxic Chemicals
Title
An Act To Further Strengthen the Protection of Pregnant Women and Children from Toxic Chemicals
Sponsors
Sen. Seth Goodall [D] | Rep. Mark Eves [D] | Sen. Justin Alfond [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] |
Rep. Ann Dorney [D] | Rep. Sara Gideon [D] | Rep. Anne Graham [D] | Rep. Gay Grant [D] |
Rep. Jane Pringle [D] | Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - Senate - RC #379 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - Recede And Concur RC #415 (Y: 78 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #370 (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - House - Recede And Concur RC #415 (Y: 78 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 43) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #370 (Y: 108 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | 19 Yeas - 14 Nays- 0 Excused - 2 Absent |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Roll Call # 379 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Secretary of the Senate |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Darek M. Grant |
2013-07-09 | Senate | ____________________ |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Enacted In Senate, June 27, 2013, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 19 in the affirmative and 14 in the negative, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2013-07-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator GOODALL Tabled pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION |
2013-07-09 | Senate | READ and ORDERED PLACED ON FILE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-27 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 415 (Yeas 78 - Nays 30 - Absent 43 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-27 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) thereto |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) thereto , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-352) thereto READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-353) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) READ and ADOPTED |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDER PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator HILL of York. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-19 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-310). |
2013-06-19 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-06-19 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 370 (Yeas 108 - Nays 37 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative WELSH of Rockport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-19 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-310). |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) READ and ADOPTED . |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator BOYLE of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-310) Report ACCEPTED . |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-03-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-26 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Boyle of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed |